skip to content

Warren, Indra Prathista

CPSO#: 91219

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: Rasaratnam, Indra Prathista (used until: 26 Feb 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2104 Old Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 9055706592
Fax: 9056321126
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

207/209-77 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Canada
Phone: 647-351-6646
Fax: 647-351-6648
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Indra Warren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Warren ( CPSO# 91219 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
2104 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 570-6592

Business Address:
207/209 - 77 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Phone Number: (647) 351-6646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. INDRA PRATHISTA WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014