skip to content

Quirt, Ian Chesney

CPSO#: 22989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2018
EXPIRY DATE
26 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416 469 3325
Fax: 416 469 8221 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Meharchand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Meharchand ( CPSO# 33394 )
Dr. I. Quirt ( CPSO# 22989 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
K2 Wing
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-3325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Ian Chesney Quirt may practise hematology at:  

                  (i)   Michael   Garron   Hospital   in   Toronto,  Ontario,  while  under
                        supervision coordinated by a supervisor  acceptable to the College;
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  only  in  accordance with the Retraining Program  approved  by  the
                        College.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires  on February 26,
                  2020.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Quirt's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Quirt's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Quirt is no longer enrolled in the Retraining Program, or
                  
                  (iv)  the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Quirt's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August 27, 2018, and will expire on or
                  before February 26, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.