skip to content

Cacic, Ivan

CPSO#: 84266

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3946
Fax: (905) 813-1515 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4288 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-0058
Fax: (905) 275-1686
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 634-5573
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cacic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2022
Corporation Name: I. Cacic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cacic ( CPSO# 84266 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: 9058132200

Business Address:
4288 Village Centre Crt
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone Number: (905) 275-0058

Business Address:
150 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
520 Locust St
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 634-5573

Business Address:
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IVAN CACIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011