skip to content

Hyland, Robert Hylton

CPSO#: 27161

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michael's Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018