skip to content

Hyde, Byron Marshall

CPSO#: 21364

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 121 Iona Street Ottawa, ON K1Y 3M1
Date Received: 05 Jul 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Nov 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2019

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Hyde’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Hyde is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. In addition to the foregoing, it is also alleged that Dr. Hyde engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to in relation to his charitable foundation, billing for uninsured services, in his communications with patients and others, inappropriate OHIP billing, and failure to maintain appropriate boundaries with a staff member.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): August 14, 2019 half day hearing start time 9:00 a.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 9, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hyde to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 9, 2019:

Dr. Hyde was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hyde resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)