skip to content

Hwozdecki, Roman Michael

CPSO#: 15500

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Dec 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1936

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1956
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Mar 1983