Hutspardol, Sakara (CPSO#: 99296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chulalongkorn University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAKARA HUTSPARDOL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HUTSPARDOL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HUTSPARDOL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HUTSPARDOL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HUTSPARDOL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HUTSPARDOL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HUTSPARDOL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019