skip to content

Hutchinson, Neil Thomas

CPSO#: 31576

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Nov 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neil T. Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017