skip to content

Hutchinson, Marie Ellen

CPSO#: 98042

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Westmount Road
Unit 205
Guelph Ontario
Guelph ON  N1H 1J2
Phone: (519) 837-1848
Fax: (519) 837-2363 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marie Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hutchinson ( CPSO# 98042 )

Business Address:
77 Westmount Road, Unit 205
Guelph ON  N1H J1
Phone Number: 5198371848

Business Address:
11 Speedvale Avenue East
Wellington ON  N1H 1J2
Phone Number: (519) 837-1848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE ELLEN HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017