skip to content

Hutchings, Robyn Jenifer

CPSO#: 88206

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 25 Apr 2008
EL - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 30 Jun 2011 to 26 Jul 2011
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2011