skip to content

Hussein, Elysha

CPSO#: 88344

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elysha Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hussein ( CPSO# 88344 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELYSHA HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010