Hussaini, Saira Niloufer (CPSO#: 99849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jan 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk in
537 Van Kirk Drive, Unit 103
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone: 905-495-5550
Fax: 905-495-2624
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane Street
Unit 5
Toronto ON  M3M1A4
Canada
Phone: 416-249-8000
Fax: 416-249-4594
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hawthorne Place Care Centre
2045 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 1M9
Canada
Phone: 416-745-0811 Ext. 450
Fax: 416-745-0568
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctors Hussaini and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Waraich ( CPSO# 91784 )
Dr. S. Hussaini ( CPSO# 99849 )

Business Address:
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk-In
103 - 537 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 0P4
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550


Corporation Name: Dr. Saira N Hussaini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussaini ( CPSO# 99849 )

Business Address:
Hawthorne Place Nursing Care
2045 Finch Avenue
North York ON  M3N 1M9

Business Address:
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk-In
103 - 537 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Saira  Niloufer  Hussaini  may  practise  medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.