skip to content

Hussain, Mohammed Farhan Iqbal

CPSO#: 92558

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Mental Health
5th Floor
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33591
Fax: (416) 747-3350 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed F. I. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussain ( CPSO# 92558 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Mental Health, 5th Floor
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2011 Active
                   Dr.  Mohammad Farhan Iqbal Hussain may practise medicine independently in
                  Psychiatry, only.