skip to content

Hussain, Fatima Maryam

CPSO#: 89666

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Division Of Geriatric Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6586
Fax: (905) 494-6623 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel Memorial Center
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-6586
Fax: (905) 494-6623
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-6586
Fax: (905) 494-6623
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. Ali and F.M. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hussain ( CPSO# 89666 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 93965 )

Business Address:
400 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-8844

Business Address:
Peel Memorial Center
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-6586

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-6586

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird drive east
brampton ON  L6R J7
Phone Number: 2892330959

Business Address:
c/o Division of Geriatric Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6586

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FATIMA MARYAM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011