skip to content

Husain, Shahid

CPSO#: 88255

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Apr 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite PMB 11 - 138
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3144
Fax: (416) 340-5442 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shahid Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Husain ( CPSO# 88255 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Suite 11PMB-138
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite PMB-11-138
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective:25 Apr 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active
             Dr. Shahid Husain may practise medicine independently in Infectious Diseases.