skip to content

Husain, Saima Fathima

CPSO#: 86469

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Department of Medicine
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 57800
Fax: 905-358-3030 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saima F. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Husain ( CPSO# 86469 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Records Location

Address: 701-4980 Kingsway Burnaby, BC V5H 4K7
Date Received: 19 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAIMA FATHIMA HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2018