skip to content

Husain, Juhi

CPSO#: 92518

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Husain ( CPSO# 92518 )

Business Address:
William Olser Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6542

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:23 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Hematology Effective:02 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:09 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active
                   Dr. Juhi Husain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
                  Medical Oncology and Haematology.