skip to content

Hurwitz, Gilbert Allan

CPSO#: 23729

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gilbert Hurwitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michael's Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Instructions: Image Report Records will be available at St. Michael's Hospital.
Date Received: 01 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014