skip to content

Hurst, Randall Reid

CPSO#: 28957

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1617 Eastgate Estates
Windsor ON  N8T 2S8
Phone: (519) 944-7193 Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13 - 1 High Meadow Pl Toronto ON M9L 0A3 tel: 1.800.775.0093 fax: 647.933.2904 [email protected] www.recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 30 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RANDALL REID HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1977

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Jan 1988
Summary:

In January 1988, Dr. Hurst pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Hurst guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Hurst be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also imposed a fine of $500.00, and directed that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of sixty days. It was further stipulated by the Committee, however, that the suspension itself would be suspended if Dr. Hurst attended the College for the reprimand, paid the fine, and submitted his practice to an inspection of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 04 Jan 1988

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 1987
Summary:

In November 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Hurst guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent respecting an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 27(27); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Hurst be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that the Doctor be fined $2500.00, and that his licence to practice medicine be suspended for a period of ninety days. It was further stipulated by the Committee, however, that the last thirty days of the period of suspension would themselves be suspended if Dr. Hurst submitted his practice to an examination by the College of the kind provided by s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, if he paid the fine, if he attended at the College for his reprimand, and if, at a time when his licence was not under suspension, he submitted the report required by the Workers' Compensation Board, pursuant to s. 57 of the Workers' Compensation Act.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1989-01-18
Hearing Date(s): 23 Nov 1987