skip to content

Hurst, David William

CPSO#: 18205

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1956
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 1957
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019