skip to content

Hurmatov, Tetyana Yaremivna

CPSO#: 94532

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Ivano-Frankivsk State Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
448 Welland Ave
St Catharines ON  L2N 7V3
Phone: (905) 688-2000
Fax: (905) 688-2008 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 28 Oct 2019 Active
             As from July 22, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Tetyana Yaremivna
            Hurmatov, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hurmatov
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR.  TETYANA YAREMIVNA HURMATOV
                                          ("Dr. Hurmatov")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, certificate of registration number 94532, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that that the College referred to the
                  Discipline Committee allegations that I engaged in professional
                  misconduct and/or am incompetent, in a Notice of Hearing dated April 11,
                  2018 (the "Notice of Hearing").

            (4)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, executed an Undertaking with the College on May 7, 2018
                  in lieu of the imposition of an Order under s. 25.4 of the Code (the "May
                  7, 2018 Undertaking"). This Undertaking replaces and supersedes the May
                  7, 2018 Undertaking.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective July 22, 2019.

            (6)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   
                  
                  (a)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions
                        or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and links to the current regulatory
                              lists are attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                              Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, with a link to the
                              current regulatory list attached hereto as Schedule "D");
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to immediately refer all patients to
                        whom I am prescribing any of the substances described in section
                        (c), above, to other physicians for assessment and care.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred
                        to other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log").
                        I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to include in the Log the name of each
                        patient referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the
                        date of referral. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (8)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
                  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (9)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "E."  For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Hurmatov must not prescribe or administer any of the following:

                        - Narcotic Drugs
                        - Narcotic Preparations
                        - Controlled Drugs
                        - Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        - Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination
                        and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (8)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov was referred to the Discipline Committee on
                              allegaitons that she engaged in professional misconduct
                              and/or is incompetent. In the face of these allegations, Dr.
                              Hurmatov agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew
                              existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                              substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27); 
                  
                              (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                                    and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);   

                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all
                              Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                                IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov must not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following: 
                  
                              - Narcotic Drugs
                              - Narcotic Preparations
                              - Controlled Drugs
                              - Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              - Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                  consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                  respectively.

            (20)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jul 2019
Summary:

On July 22, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the 
 Discipline Committee found that Dr. Tetyana Yaremivna Hurmatov committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession, and has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability) 
 Dr. Hurmatov is 41 years old, and practices family medicine in St. Catharines, Ontario. She 
 received her certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College in 2010. 
 Information from the Narcotics Monitoring System 

 In October 2016, the College received information from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term 
Care’s Narcotics Monitoring System regarding Dr. Hurmatov’s prescribing of controlled drugs, 
including narcotics, from January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2015 (the “NMS data”). 
The NMS data indicated that Dr. Hurmatov had been identified as a physician who, in 2015, had 
eight or more patients receiving at least 650 oral morphine equivalents (“OMEs”) per day, and 
who had issued at least one prescription exceeding 20,000 OMEs. 
Investigation of Dr. Hurmatov’s Practice 

 The College retained Dr. Andrew Grant to opine on Dr. Hurmatov’s prescribing of controlled 
 substances, with a specific focus on the use of opioids for non-cancer pain. Dr. Grant identified a 
 number of issues with Dr. Hurmatov’s opioid prescribing: 
    a) Dr. Hurmatov prescribed a high-dose opioid to a patient attempting to get pregnant; 
    b) Dr. Hurmatov provided a patient with dosing instructions for use of high-dose long-
       acting opioids on an as-needed (“PRN”) basis, leading to large dose fluctuations with no 
       gradual titration upwards; 
    c) Patients self-escalated their opioid doses, contrary to signed opioid contracts which stated 
       that patients were only to take opioids at the doses prescribed by Dr. Hurmatov. Although 
       Dr. Hurmatov did warn some patients not to self-escalate their dose, in some other cases 
       Dr. Hurmatov’s responded by increasing the dose of prescribed opioid to the amount that 
       the patient had achieved by self-escalation; 
    d) Dr. Hurmatov’s poor interpretation of urine drug screen results. In six cases, Dr. 
       Hurmatov continued prescribing high dose opiates in the setting of urine drug screen 
       results that were significantly abnormal and that potentially indicated drug addiction 
       and/or diversion; 
    e) Dr. Hurmatov concurrently prescribed large dose immediate release opioids in addition to 
       large dose controlled release opioids, indicating a lack of knowledge about the 
       appropriate use and dosing of short acting opioids; 
    f) In three cases, Dr. Hurmatov rotated patients’ opioids at high doses, without reducing the 
       morphine equivalent dose of the new opioid to account for lack of tolerance; 
    g) There was poor tracking of patients’ opioid renewal dates, inappropriate early refills, and 
       lack of oversight with respect to patients’ accumulation of surplus high dose opioids; 
    h) Dr. Hurmatov frequently used controlled release opioids at a shorter dosing interval than 
       recommended (i.e. with TID or QID dosing); 
    i) Dr. Hurmatov co-prescribed benzodiazepines with high dose opioids; and 
    j) Dr. Hurmatov rapidly escalated patients’ doses of controlled release opioids. 
 The College also retained Dr. Linda Klapwyk to provide an opinion as to Dr. Hurmatov’s 
 prescribing practices, other than with respect to her opioid prescribing. Dr. Klapwyk expressed a 
 number of concerns with respect to Dr. Hurmatov’s prescribing: 
   a) Concomitant prescribing of benzodiazepines with high-dose opioids, which may result in 
      profound sedation, respiratory depression, coma, and death, and which should very rarely 
      be prescribed together; 
   b) Prescribing of benzodiazepines in high doses and for long periods of time; 
   c) Combining central nervous system depressants such as anticonvulsants, antipsychotics, 
      hypnotics, and skeletal muscle relaxants with opioids; 
   d) Inappropriate prescribing of stimulants to address complaints of fatigue and sedation in 
      patients to whom central nervous system depressants had also been prescribed; 
   e) Prescribing Olanzapine, an atypical antipsychotic indicated for schizophrenia or bipolar 
      disorder, for sleep in a patient who was overmedicated, at risk for respiratory depression, 
      and did not have an indication for an olanzapine prescription other than sedation as there 
      was no documentation of schizophrenia or bipolar disorder; 
   f) Failure to reduce patients’ prescriptions for sedatives despite documentation of side-
      effects or harm such as sedation, fatigue, and impaired cognition. 
Self-prescribing and Self-Treatment 
Between 2011 and 2017, Dr. Hurmatov wrote numerous prescriptions in her name and the name 
of her clinic for her own use and/or which she used and treated herself, between approximately 
2011 and 2017, including for narcotics and controlled substances: 
   a) Dr. Hurmatov started herself on Cipralex 10mg in January 2011; 
   b) In the fall of 2011, Dr. Hurmatov injected herself with Juvederm hydrate. She obtained 
      the filler over the Internet from Ireland. She developed facial edema and neck swelling, 
      which she self-treated with Prednisone, subsequent injections of Kenalog and 
      Hyaluronidase, Lasix, antibiotics, Percocet, and Tylenol #1. Dr. Hurmatov developed 
      adrenal insufficiency with Cushingoid appearance due to self-administering cortisone 
      injections; 
   c) In December 2011, Dr. Hurmatov was started on Pristiq 50mg per day by another 
      physician. Dr. Hurmatov increased the Pristiq to 100mg on her own, and later lowered it 
      back down to 50 mg; 
   d) In January 2012, Dr. Hurmatov started herself on Temazepam and Atenolol; 
   e) In March 2012, Dr. Hurmatov began self-prescribing Dilaudid 2 mg. She sourced the 
      Dilaudid, an opioid, from tablets returned by a patient. She also gave herself Xylocaine 
      occipital nerve blocks; 
   f) In June 2013 and April 2014, Dr. Hurmatov took Nootropil that she had ordered online, 
      to help relax and as a memory aid; 
   g) In March 2014, Dr. Hurmatov had some sleep problems which she attempted to self-treat 
       by taking extra amounts of Clonazepam; 
h) By 2017, Dr. Hurmatov had been prescribed Cymbalta 30 mg and Zopiclone 7.5 mg by 
   another physician. She increased the Cymbalta to 60 mg and the Zopiclone to 15 mg 
   without a physician’s approval; 
i) In June 2017, the College received information from the NMS that Dr. Hurmatov 
   prescribed benzodiazepines to herself between March 2013 and April 2017, as follows: 
                                                                  Days’ 
         Date        Drug                                Quantity 
                                                                  Supply 
         2013/03/14  Ativan Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab        30.0     5 
         2014/03/24  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2014/07/28  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2014/08/19  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2014/09/08  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2014/09/30  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2014/10/20  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2015/01/05  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2015/03/09  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2015/05/04  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2015/06/12  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2015/07/23  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2015/11/09  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2015/12/09  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/02/11  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2016/03/11  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     30 
         2016/06/20  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/07/04  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/07/19  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/08/03  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/08/25  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/10/08  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/10/28  Apo-Clonazepam/2mg/Tab              12.0     10 
         2016/11/08  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2016/11/25  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2017/01/09  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2017/03/15  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2017/03/21  Apo-Lorazepam Sublingual/1mg/SL Tab 30.0     10 
         2017/04/27  Apo-Lorazepam/2mg/Tab               15.0     5 
    
j) In addition to writing herself prescriptions for benzodiazepines as set out above, Dr. 
   Hurmatov also self-prescribed other medications, as follows: 
         Date         Drug Name 
         14-Jan-2015  CAP Prometrium 100mg 
         15-Mar-2016  CAP Prometrium 100mg 
         15-Apr-2016  TAB Apo-Sumatriptan 100mg 
         10-Jun-2016  TAB Apo-Eletriptan 20mg 
            Date         Drug Name 
            29-Jul-2016  TAB Apo-Sumatriptan 100mg 
            15-Mar-2016  GM Estrogel 0.06% 
            18-Mar-2016  TAB Cytomel 25mcg 
            10-Feb-2017  CAP Prometrium 100mg 
 
Dr. Hurmatov’s self-prescribing took place in the context of depression and anxiety. Since 
February 2018, Dr. Hurmatov has been under the treatment of a physician, and there have been 
no further issues with self-prescribing. 
 
Treatment of Family Members 
 
Between 2011 and 2017, Dr. Hurmatov wrote prescriptions for family members: 

            a) Family Member A: 
            Date         Drug Name                                   Quantity 
            17-Oct-2011  TAB Dexedrine 5mg                           20 
            04-Feb-2013  CAP Tamiflu 75mg                            10 
            29-Jul-2015  CAP Apo-Minocycline                         30 
            29-Jul-2015  TAB Apo-Indapamide 2.5mg                    20 
            21-Sep-2016  GM Fiducin Cream 2%                         60 
 
            b) Family Member B: 
            Date         Drug Name                                   Quantity 
            02-Oct-2014  ML Apo-Amoxi Oral Susp 125mg/5ml            100 
            02-Oct-2014  ML Apo-Amoxi Oral Susp 125mg/5ml            100 
            27-Sep-2016  DOS Omnaris 50mcg/act                       120 
 
            c) Family Member C: 
            Date         Drug Name                                   Quantity 
            04-Feb-2013  CAP Tamiflu 45mg                            10 
 
            d) Family Member D: 
            Date         Drug Name                                   Quantity 
            30-Jan-2012  POW Pms-Azithromycin 200mg/5ml              15 
            30-Jan-2012  ML Sandoz-Azithromycin 200mg/5ml            15 
            07-Apr-2015  ML Apo-Amoxi Oral Susp (Sugar Free) 125mg/5ml 100 
            10-Nov-2015  ML Apo-Amoxi Oral Susp (Sugar Free) 125mg/5ml 100 
            03-Dec-2016  ML Apo-Amoxi Oral Susp 125mg/5ml            150 
            06-Feb-2017  ML Apo-Amoxi Oral Susp 125mg/5ml            150 
 
 
 
 
e) Family Member E 
Date         Drug Name                                   Quantity 
04-Feb-2013  TAB Apo-Cefprozil 500mg                     20 
04-Feb-2013  CAP Tamiflu 75mg                            10 
22-Feb-2013  STR Oracle Test Strips                      100 
22-Mar-2013  TAB Co-Rizatroptan ODT 10mg                 10 
22-Mar-2013  TAB Pms-Metodopramide 10mg                  30 
25-Mar-2013  WAF Maxalt RPD 10mg                         6 
15-Apr-2013  WAF Maxalt RPD 10mg                         12 
07-Sep-2013  DOS Nitrolingual Pumpspray 0.4mg            200 
07-Sep-2013  DOS Ventolin HFA 100mcg                     200 
02-Nov-2013  TAB Apo-Valacyclovir 500mg                  30 
21-Nov-2013  TAB Apo-Valacyclovir 500mg                  60 
28-Aug-2014  CAP Apo-Amoxi 500mg                         21 
02-Mar-2015  TAB Apo-Escitalopram 20mg                   180 
09-Jun-2015  TAB Mylan-Ciprofloxacin 500mg               28 
02-Oct-2015  CAP Mylan-Minocycline 100mg                 20 
15-Oct-2015  TAB Mylan-Ciprofloxacin 500mg               20 
11-Feb-2016  GM Anusol-HC Ointment                       30 
01-Mar-2016  CAP Apo-Amoxl 500mg                         30 
18-Mar-2016  TAB Apo-Atenol 50mg                         90 
21-May-2016  GM Anusol-HC Ointment                       60 
16-Jun-2016  ML Apo-Olopantadine 0.1%                    5 
16-Jun-2016  TAB-Mylan-Baclofen 20mg                     60 
16-Jun-2016  TAB Apo-Metoprolol (L) 100mg                200 
16-Jun-2016  TAB Novo-Rabeprazole EC 20mg                100 
18-Mar-2016  CAP Creon 25                                100 
07-Jul-2016  CAP Creon 25                                270 
03-Aug-2016  TAB Pms-Ciprofloxacin XL 500mg              20 
24-Aug-2016  TAB Novo-Lexin 500mg                        40 
09-Sep-2016  GM Taro-Mometasone 0.1%                     60 
09-Sep-2016  GM Ketoderm Cream 2%                        60 
09-Sep-2016  TAB Novo-Semide 40mg                        30 
13-Sep-2016  CAP Xenical 120mg                           84 
19-Sep-2016  TAB Teva-Almotriptan 12.5mg                 6 
19-Sep-2016  CAP Apo-Amoxi 500mg                         40 
26-Mar-2016  TAB Glucobay 10mg                           120 
26-Mar-2016  TAB Apo-Metformin 500mg                     300 
22-Sep-2016  GM Fucidin Cream 2%                         90 
09-Sep-2016  TAB Mylan-Baclofen 20mg                     60 
09-Sep-2016  ML Ratio-Ectosone Scalp Lotion 0.1%         150 
12-Oct-2016  TAB Apo-Baclofen 20mg                       180 
22-Nov-2016  CAP Apo-Amoxi 500mg                         30 
03-Dec-2016  TAB Apo-Amoxi Clav 875/125 875/125mg        20 
            Date         Drug Name                                   Quantity 
            15-Dec-2016  TAB Novo-Sucralate 1gm                      60 
            15-Dec-2016  TAB Pantoprazole Magnesium 40 mg            100 
            20-Dec-2016  TAB Acto-Clarithromycin XL 500 mg           20 
            09-Sep-2016  DOS Apo-Ciclesonide 50mcg/spray             120 
            30-Dec-2016  TAB Apo- Baclofen                           180 
            03-Jan-2017  CAP Creon 25                                90 
            06-Feb-2017  TAB Apo-Bisoprolol 5mg                      60 
            06-Feb-2017  CAP Xenical 120mg                           30 
            06-Feb-2017  GM Anusol-HC Ointment                       60 
            14-Feb-2017  CAP Apo-Hydroxyzine 50mg                    30 
            26-Jun-2017  ML Ciprodex Otic Soln                       7.5 
 
Dr. Hurmatov did not maintain patient charts for the family members to whom she prescribed 
and treated. Dr. Hurmatov did not bill OHIP for prescribing to and treating her family members. 
Dr. Hurmatov engaged in this treatment of her family members during a period when she was 
suffering from depression and anxiety, and in the context of a difficult family dynamic. Since 
November 2017, Dr. Hurmatov’s family members have been exclusively under the care of an 
unrelated family physician. 
 
ADMISSION 
 
Dr. Hurmatov admits the facts above, and admits that, based on these facts, she engaged in 
professional misconduct under: 
   a) paragraph 1(1)2 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in 
      that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and 
  b) paragraph 1(1)33 of O Reg. 856/93, in that she engaged in acts or omissions relevant to 
     the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
     dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS (PENALTY) 
 
On July 16, 2019, Dr. Hurmatov entered into an undertaking with the College by which, among 
other things, she permanently agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing 
prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances, effective July 22, 2019: 
   a) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled 
      Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
   b) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
      Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
   c) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and 
     Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);  
   d) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and 
      Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances 
      Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); and 
   e) Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 
      2010, c. 22).    
DISPOSITION 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
   -  Dr. Hurmatov attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Hurmatov’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, commencing from July 23, 2019, at 12:01 a.m. 
   -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hurmatov’s 
      certificate of registration: 
      (i)   Dr. Hurmatov will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program 
            offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a 
           passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.  Dr. Hurmatov 
           will complete the PROBE program within 6 months of the date of this Order, and 
           will provide proof to the College of her completion, including proof of 
           registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) 
           month of completing it. 
   -  Dr. Hurmatov pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): July 22, 2019 half day hearing start time 1:00 p.m.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tetyana Yaremivna to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 22, 2019:

Dr. Hurmatov was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegaitons that she engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hurmatov agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Hurmatov must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Hurmatov must not prescribe or administer any of the following:

- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca