skip to content

Huot, David John

CPSO#: 29183

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Combined Maternal-Newborn Care Unit
Ottawa Hospital, General Campus 8E
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8642
Fax: (613) 744-0711 Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record can contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at (416) 398-0638.
Date Received: 23 Jan 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN HUOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Dr. Huot has completed all components of the SCERP effective September 1, 2017.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)