skip to content

Huo, Jeanne Zhen

CPSO#: 95753

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2035
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone: (905) 604-5535
Fax: (905) 604-7669 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Evergreen Hospice
Palliative Care Physicians
Suite 201
5762 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P1A8
Canada
Phone: 4164992185
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeanne Huo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huo ( CPSO# 95753 )

Business Address:
32 South Unionville Avenue
Suite 2035
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone Number: (905) 604-5535

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEANNE ZHEN HUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014