skip to content

Hunter, Joseph Barry

CPSO#: 30633

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.B. Hunter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 365 Rosslyn Dr. Burlington ON L7N 1S5
Date Received: 06 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 24 Mar 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2019