skip to content

Hunter, Alasdair Grant Walker

CPSO#: 26368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Apr 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For medical records patient should contact the Genetic Clinic where patient was seen.
Date Received: 08 Jun 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:10 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:29 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017