skip to content

Hunt, Susan Patricia

CPSO#: 100460

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Chisholm, Susan Patricia (used until: 11 Nov 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613)695-1870 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN PATRICIA HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015