skip to content

Hundt, Penelope Kate

CPSO#: 95361

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Appletree Medical Centre 140 The Esplanade Toronto, Ontario M5A 4P5
Date Received: 11 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2012