skip to content

Humphries, Paul Wellington

CPSO#: 20753

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2008

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Jun-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2008