skip to content

Humen, Dennis Paul

CPSO#: 29713

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dennis Humen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 339 Windermere Road, London, ON N6A 5A5
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact the Division of Cardiology at London Health Sciences Centre at (519) 663-3671.
Date Received: 10 Apr 2015


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016