skip to content

Hulme, Jennifer Meghan

CPSO#: 98363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3856 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Walsh and Hulme Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hulme ( CPSO# 98363 )
Dr. C. Walsh ( CPSO# 99189 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5801

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MEGHAN HULME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HULME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015