skip to content

Hull, Christopher Merritt

CPSO#: 85956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
253A Main St
Glencoe ON  N0L 1M0
Phone: (519) 287-2616 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-5295
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Hull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hull ( CPSO# 85956 )

Business Address:
253A Main Street
Glencoe ON  N0L 1M0
Phone Number: (519) 287-2616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MERRITT HULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 21 Feb 2007 to 07 Mar 2007
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007