skip to content

Hukui, Julie Naomi Marie

CPSO#: 98411

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Hukui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hukui ( CPSO# 98411 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 530-6625

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIE NAOMI MARIE HUKUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUKUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016