skip to content

Hujic, Nirvana

CPSO#: 89729

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University Of Banja Luka, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
Family Health Group
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: N. Hujic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hujic ( CPSO# 89729 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
Family Health Group
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIRVANA HUJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUJIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009