skip to content

Hui, Melody

CPSO#: 93973

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: 905 873 0111 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

421 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Canada
Phone: 416 920 4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melody Hui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hui ( CPSO# 93973 )

Business Address:
470 Dupont St.
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Phone Number: (416) 588-1888

Business Address:
Suite 202
421 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Phone Number: (416) 920-4200

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 696-1890

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELODY HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012