skip to content

Hui, Frederick

CPSO#: 31602

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Aug 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Bloor Street East
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Phone: (416) 920-4200
Fax: (416) 920-4204 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Bryne Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 9E9
Canada
Phone: 705 721 1969
Fax: 705721 1859
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

18 Wynford Dr.
North York ON  M3C 3S2
Canada
Phone: 416 4430811
Fax: 416 443 0482
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 25 Sep 2019 Active
             (1 of 2)

            As  from September 25, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations  on  the  certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Hui, in
            accordance with an undertaking  and  consent given by Dr. Hui to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                             ("Undertaking") 

                                                 of
                                     DR. FREDERICK HUI ("Dr. Hui")
                  
                                                 to
                  
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                             (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act,  1991,  S.O.  1991,  c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public  Register"  means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hui, certificate  of registration number 31602, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that following a complaint, the College conducted
                  an investigation bearing File  Number  1101074 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct  and/or am incompetent in my
                  family and complementary medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I,  Dr. Hui, undertake to abide by the provisions  of  this  Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Hui, undertake that I will cease to engage in the practice
                        of stem cell therapy.
                  
            (6)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms
                        of all my  Practice  Locations,  in  a  clearly  visible and secure
                        location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." For further clarity,
                        this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Hui must not  engage  in the
                        practice of stem cell therapy. Further information may be found  on
                        the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Hui,  undertake  to  post a certified translation  in  any
                        language in which I provide services,  of  the  sign  described  in
                        section  (6)(a)  in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible  and  secure  location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A."
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Hui,  undertake  to  provide  the   certified  translation
                        described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hui, undertake that if I elect, after the  execution of this
                        Undertaking,  to  provide  services in any other language,  I  will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr. Hui, undertake to provide  to  the  College  the  certified
                        translation  described  in  section  (6)(b)  prior  to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Hui,  undertake  to  inform the College of each and  every
                        location where I practise or have  privileges,  including,  but not
                        limited  to,  any  hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with  which  I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively  my  "Practice Location"  or  "Practice  Locations"),
                        within  five (5)  days   of   executing   this  Undertaking.  Going
                        forward,  I  further undertake to inform the College of any and all
                        new Practice Locations  within five (5) days of commencing practice
                        at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hui, undertake that  I  will  submit  to,  and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations  and patient
                        charts  by  a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hui, give  my  irrevocable  consent  to  the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that  may have relevant information, in order for  the  College  to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                        attached hereto as Appendix "B".

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge  and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs,  charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained  independent  legal  counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right  to  do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any  Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr.  Hui,  acknowledge  that  a  breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an act of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in  a  referral  of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Hui,  acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes   terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that,  during  the  time  period  that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted  on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted  in  accordance  with  section  (14)(a) above, the following
                        summary  shall  be posted on the Public Register  during  the  time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation  was  conducted  into whether Dr. Hui
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or  was incompetent in
                              his  practice  of  family  and complementary medicine.  As  a
                              result of the investigation,  Dr.  Hui must not practise stem
                              cell therapy.
                  
                              Dr.  Hui shall post a clearly visible  sign  in  the  waiting
                              rooms  of  all  Practice  Locations, which states as follows:
                              "Dr.  Hui  must  not engage in  the  practice  of  stem  cell
                              therapy. Further information  may  be found on the College of
                              Physicians    and    Surgeons    of   Ontario   website    at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".

            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Hui, give my irrevocable consent to the  College  to  provide  all
                  Chiefs  of  Staff  with  any  information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (2 of 2)

            As from June 12, 2014, the following  is  imposed  as  a  term,  condition  and
            limitation  on  the  certificate  of registration held by Dr. Frederick Hui, in
            accordance with an undertaking and  consent  given by Dr. Hui to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Hui may not engage in the following treatments and/or procedures:
                  
                  (i)   IV colchicine treatment;
                  (ii)  hydrogen peroxide in dosages greater than .0375%;
                  (iii) epidurals;
                  (iv)  small scale scalpel surgery;
                  (v)   IV antibiotics unless oral antibiotics  have  been  tried and found
                        not to be successful;
                  (vi)  non-topical silver; and
                  
                  Dr.  Hui  shall not prescribe a different conventional medication  for  a
                  chronic  condition   that  is  being  treated  by  the  patient's  family
                  doctor/general practitioner  for  the chronic condition, unless and until
                  he has communicated this change with  the patient's family doctor/general
                  practitioner.
                  

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick Hui to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 25, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hui engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his practice of family and complementary medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Hui must not practise stem cell therapy.

Dr. Hui shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Hui must not engage in the practice of stem cell therapy. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.