Hui, Edith Wan Yan (CPSO#: 99312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Aug 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Care Medical Centre
Unit 30
747 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1T2
Phone: (416) 421-8372
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Don Mills Medical Clinic
825 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 383-1251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hui ( CPSO# 32946 )
Dr. E. Hui ( CPSO# 99312 )

Business Address:
30 - 747 Don Mills Road
Don Mills ON  M3C 1T2
Phone Number: (416) 421-8372


Corporation Name: Edith Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hui ( CPSO# 99312 )

Business Address:
Family Care Medical Centre
Suite 30
747 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1T2
Phone Number: (416) 421-8372

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Edith Wan Yan Hui may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.