skip to content

Hughes, William Guy

CPSO#: 31872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
327 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: 7058433555 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

23 Front Street South
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
P.O.Box 459
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

North Hastings Family Health Team
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Northumberland Hill Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. William Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hughes ( CPSO# 31872 )

Business Address:
North Hastings Family Health Team
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0

Business Address:
Suite 204
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 743-3555

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7129 Gelert Road
P.O. Box 870, 2nd Floor
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 475-1212

Business Address:
23 Front Street South
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GUY HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1980

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person in connection with communication with patients.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person in connection with College policy on Ending Physician-Patient Relationship.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person in connection with Annual Renewal Form to College.
Download Full Document (PDF)