skip to content

Hughes, Harley John Garland

CPSO#: 14940

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 1-Feb-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.