skip to content

Hughes, Dolores Martha Burant

CPSO#: 24108

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 08 Feb 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Wisconsin, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983