skip to content

Hugh, Sarah Christina

CPSO#: 95752

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1435 Plains Road East
Unit 5
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone: 905-681-1400
Fax: 905-335-5995 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sarah Christina Hugh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hugh ( CPSO# 95752 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
1435 Plains Road East
Unit 5
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone Number: (905) 681-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH CHRISTINA HUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016