skip to content

Jellie, Hugh Gibson

CPSO#: 50848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 306
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 579-2020
Fax: (519) 579-2954 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hugh G. Jellie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jellie ( CPSO# 50848 )

Business Address:
306 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 579-2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUGH GIBSON JELLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JELLIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1984