skip to content

Huggins, David Greenwood

CPSO#: 23819

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.G.Huggins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013