skip to content

Huff, Hildegard Rosemarie

CPSO#: 31410

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
03 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Wagner, Hildegard Rosemarie (used until: 15 Jan 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. R. Huff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2020