skip to content

Hudson, Emmanuel William

CPSO#: 32026

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cross Cancer Institute
11560 University Ave.
Edmonton AB  T6G 1Z2
Phone: (780) 432-8220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:02 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL WILLIAM HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989