skip to content

Hudson, Andrew

CPSO#: 96066

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Main St E
Huntsville ON  P1H 2C6
Phone: 7057892145
Fax: 7057894622 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hudson and Love Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Love ( CPSO# 95327 )
Dr. A. Hudson ( CPSO# 96066 )

Business Address:
203 - 348 Muskoka Road
3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-2145

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
PO Box 550
150 Huston St
Burks Falls ON  P0A 1C0
Phone Number: 7053824020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013