skip to content

Hudecova, Maria

CPSO#: 91401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TBRHSC
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maria Hudecova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hudecova ( CPSO# 91401 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA HUDECOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDECOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014