skip to content

Huband, Donald Murray

CPSO#: 22403

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. M. Huband Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Medical Records Location

Instructions: 83 Dawson Road Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Date Received: 22 Jan 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:18 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 2020