skip to content

Huard, Pierre Joseph

CPSO#: 28727

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pierre Huard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Dante Pascali Suite 106 152 Cleopatra Drive Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018