skip to content

Huang, Yi Min

CPSO#: 98044

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Spanish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
2830 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Phone: (416) 633-7337 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yi Min Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Huang ( CPSO# 98044 )

Business Address:
402 - 2830 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 633-7337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YI MIN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015