skip to content

Huang, Virgil Yao-Feng

CPSO#: 94654

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cassandra Clinic
2044-2048 Victoria Park Avenue
North York ON  M1R 1V2
Phone: (416) 331-9111
Fax: (416) 331-9050 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bayview Hill Medical Centre
Unit 20
1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-8628
Fax: (905) 237-8618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Virgil Y. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Huang ( CPSO# 94654 )

Business Address:
Suite 2044
2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Phone Number: (416) 331-9111

Business Address:
Suite 20
1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M2


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Taiwan
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active
 Dr.  Virgil  Yao-Feng Huang may practise medicine independently in office-based
            paediatrics, only.